U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00056
  • Case Name: Rozajewski v. Castleton
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [USCA Order]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 14, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 11, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 07, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • December 06, 2016: [Dismiss]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • October 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 06, 2016: [Response to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Stay]
May, 2016
  • May 10, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 19, 2016: [Receipt]
  • April 07, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • February 04, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • February 04, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • February 04, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • February 04, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • February 04, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.