U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00058
  • Case Name: Seybert v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: [Order]
  • January 03, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Order]
  • December 28, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [Stipulation]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Judgment]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • March 30, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2016
  • August 09, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Administrative Record]
  • May 31, 2016: [Answer to Petition for Review]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • March 17, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • March 14, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • March 11, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2016
  • February 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 08, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • February 08, 2016: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • February 08, 2016: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • February 08, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • February 05, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • February 05, 2016: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • February 05, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 05, 2016: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.