U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00057
  • Case Name: DeLeon v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • June 01, 2017: [Response to Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • March 31, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 31, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 31, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 09, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 21, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 06, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
June, 2016
  • June 06, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
May, 2016
  • May 05, 2016: [Administrative Record]
  • May 05, 2016: [Answer to Petition for Review]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • February 23, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 22, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 18, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 08, 2016: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • February 08, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.