U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00059
  • Case Name: Beals v. State of Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2016
  • November 03, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 02, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • October 24, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order]
  • October 19, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Letter]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Receipt]
  • February 16, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 16, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • February 09, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • February 09, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • February 09, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.