U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00060
  • Case Name: Hawkins v. Corizon Medical Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Judgment]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Order]
  • April 26, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 26, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 09, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • October 13, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order]
  • August 30, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 30, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Produce]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Produce]
  • April 11, 2017: [Take Judicial Notice]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 31, 2017: [Order]
  • March 31, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
May, 2016
  • May 04, 2016: [Order]
  • May 04, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • February 09, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • February 09, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.