U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00061
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Dix Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 10, 2017: [Dismiss]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • February 02, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • February 02, 2017: [Declaration]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • January 18, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [ADR Plan]
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • May 10, 2016: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 06, 2016: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • May 02, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
April, 2016
  • April 12, 2016: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • April 12, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • April 11, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 11, 2016: [Counterclaim]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Order]
  • March 30, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 29, 2016: [1-Applicable Party Document-to be used ONLY in conjunction with other selection]
  • March 29, 2016: [Order]
  • March 25, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • March 11, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 08, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 26, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • February 26, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 25, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 25, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 25, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 08, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 08, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.