U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00063
  • Case Name: TELIC INTERNATIONAL LLC et al v. OKABASHI BRANDS INC.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 21, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2016
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Stay]
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Order]
  • June 15, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 15, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 13, 2016: [Stay]
  • June 09, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2016
  • May 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 04, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • May 03, 2016: [Stay]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2016: [Litigation Order]
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • March 31, 2016: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • March 31, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 30, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 28, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 15, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 14, 2016: [Sealed Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 14, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 09, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • March 09, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 09, 2016: [Supplement]
  • March 09, 2016: [Third Party Complaint]
  • March 09, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 09, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • March 08, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 08, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 08, 2016: [Sealed Response to Motion]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 07, 2016: [Errata]
  • March 04, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 04, 2016: [Order]
  • March 04, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 02, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • March 02, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • March 02, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 25, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 24, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • February 24, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 24, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 23, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 23, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order]
  • February 22, 2016: [Certificate of Counsel]
  • February 22, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • February 22, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 22, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • February 19, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 19, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 10, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • February 09, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 09, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.