U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00066
  • Case Name: Phillips v. Smith & Nephew, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Dismiss]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
  • January 19, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • January 17, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 01, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 01, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • November 16, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [Order]
  • October 11, 2016: [Stipulation]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • August 12, 2016: [Stipulation]
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • June 27, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Order]
  • April 18, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 18, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 05, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • March 14, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 09, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 11, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 11, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • February 10, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 10, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.