U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00067
  • Case Name: Webster v. Boundary Regional Community Health Center, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 27, 2016: [Dismiss]
November, 2016
  • November 01, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
  • May 18, 2016: [~Util - Set Hearings]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
March, 2016
  • March 11, 2016: [Order]
  • March 11, 2016: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order]
  • March 08, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 03, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 03, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 01, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • February 17, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 11, 2016: [Order]
  • February 11, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 11, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 11, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • February 11, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 11, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • February 11, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • February 10, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.