U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00069
  • Case Name: Hokanson v. CTI-SSI Food Services, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 10, 2017: [Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • April 20, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • April 17, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 15, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 09, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2016
  • September 09, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 09, 2016: [Order]
  • September 09, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • September 08, 2016: [Protective Order]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [ADR Plan]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2016
  • June 17, 2016: [Order]
  • June 17, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 16, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order]
  • June 09, 2016: [Stipulation]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • May 04, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
April, 2016
  • April 04, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 16, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 16, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order]
  • March 15, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 15, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • March 14, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Order]
  • February 24, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 18, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • February 12, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.