U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00071
  • Case Name: White v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 10, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 12, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • October 05, 2016: [Appellants Reply Brief]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Declaration]
  • August 19, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 11, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Appellants Brief]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 20, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Administrative Record]
  • May 23, 2016: [Answer to Petition for Review]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • March 10, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • March 09, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • March 08, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 19, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 18, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • February 18, 2016: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • February 12, 2016: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • February 12, 2016: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.