U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00070
  • Case Name: Arbon Valley Solar LLC et al v. Thomas & Betts Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 21, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 13, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
August, 2017
  • August 01, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 13, 2017: [Response to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 20, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • February 20, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 20, 2017: [Order]
  • January 20, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 20, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Supplement]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Stipulation]
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Order]
  • June 15, 2016: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • June 15, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 03, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 09, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 20, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 06, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 18, 2016: [Errata]
  • March 18, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • March 16, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • February 18, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order]
  • February 17, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 12, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 12, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.