U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-00164-
  • Case Name: Howard Michael Huls
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hillen, Noah G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Approving Trustee's Report of No Distribution and Closing Case]
  • May 26, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hillen, Noah G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 25, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hillen, Noah G. [Approving Trustee's Report of No Distribution and Closing Case (No Asset)]
  • May 23, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hillen, Noah G. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor(s)]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hillen, Noah G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 19, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hillen, Noah G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ch.7/13 Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • February 17, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hillen, Noah G. [Income Tax Turnover Order]
  • February 16, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hillen, Noah G. [Social Security Statement (SEALED)]
  • February 16, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hillen, Noah G. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.