U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00074
  • Case Name: Savage v. Davison et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 16, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2016
  • April 07, 2016: [Order]
  • April 07, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • April 07, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 22, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • March 22, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 22, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • February 17, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • February 16, 2016: [Complaint]
  • February 16, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • February 16, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.