U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00073
  • Case Name: Savage v. Gelok et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • August 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 11, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • August 04, 2017: [Affidavit]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • July 17, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 13, 2017: [Order]
  • July 13, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 11, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2017
  • February 02, 2017: [Response (generic)]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 19, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 17, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 12, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 11, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 11, 2017: [Statement]
  • January 11, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 11, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 11, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Default Judgment]
  • December 28, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 28, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 28, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • November 28, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • November 07, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • November 04, 2016: [Stay]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 25, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2016
  • September 01, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • July 25, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2016
  • June 03, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • April 27, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 27, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 27, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2016: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • April 07, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order]
  • April 07, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • April 07, 2016: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • April 04, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 22, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • March 22, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 22, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • February 22, 2016: [Supplement]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • February 17, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • February 16, 2016: [Complaint]
  • February 16, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • February 16, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.