U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00075
  • Case Name: Peterson v. United States Army Corps of Engineers
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 04, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 03, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 29, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 29, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 28, 2018: [Certificate of Counsel]
  • March 28, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 28, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 28, 2018: [Order]
  • March 28, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Status Report]
  • January 17, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 17, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 25, 2017: [In Limine]
  • August 24, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 24, 2017: [In Limine]
  • August 22, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 10, 2017: [Response to Motion]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 20, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • July 20, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • July 07, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 06, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • July 06, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 06, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 06, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • July 05, 2017: [Protective Order]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • April 05, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 07, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • March 01, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 24, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 21, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 16, 2017: [Settlement Conference]
  • February 16, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 16, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • February 08, 2017: [Expedite]
  • February 06, 2017: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • February 03, 2017: [Exclude]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 20, 2017: [Order]
  • January 20, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Order]
  • October 24, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • October 20, 2016: [Order]
  • October 20, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 09, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • May 09, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 09, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 09, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • May 06, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 03, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 04, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 22, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • February 19, 2016: [Litigation Order]
  • February 18, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 18, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 18, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.