U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00077
  • Case Name: ISS River Partners, LLC v. United State of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 02, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 01, 2016: [Dismiss]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 02, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • June 02, 2016: [Declaration]
  • June 02, 2016: [Response to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 23, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 18, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • March 29, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • February 19, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 18, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.