U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00076
  • Case Name: Mitchell v. Winco Foods LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 12, 2019: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • October 12, 2019: [Transcript]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • September 25, 2019: [Notice of Cross Appeal]
  • September 24, 2019: [Transcript Request]
  • September 19, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 19, 2019: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • September 18, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 21, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • August 21, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 03, 2019: [Response to Motion]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 13, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • June 13, 2019: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • June 13, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Certify]
  • May 24, 2019: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • May 10, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 10, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 10, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 18, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2019: [Stay]
  • April 04, 2019: [Response to Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order]
  • March 21, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • March 14, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 14, 2019: [Response to Motion]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order]
  • February 11, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • January 25, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order]
  • January 16, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 07, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • December 10, 2018: [USCA Memorandum]
  • December 10, 2018: [USCA Order]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Appeal Transcript]
  • February 09, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
January, 2018
  • January 10, 2018: [Transcript Request]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • December 14, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 11, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • November 13, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 10, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • March 07, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 07, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 07, 2016: [Stipulation]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Response to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 21, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • July 18, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • July 05, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • June 21, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 17, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • June 08, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 03, 2016: [Response to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 09, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 21, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • April 20, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • March 15, 2016: [Order]
  • March 14, 2016: [Stipulation]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 22, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 22, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • February 18, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.