U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00079
  • Case Name: Hall et al v. Bosch Thermotechnology Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 29, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Report of Mediation]
  • May 21, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 09, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Statement]
  • March 30, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 09, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 09, 2018: [In Limine]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
  • October 05, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Order]
  • July 13, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2017
  • March 06, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Stipulation]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 23, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 23, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • January 17, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 15, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 15, 2016: [Order]
  • December 15, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 07, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • December 07, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 15, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • October 28, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 28, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Retain]
  • October 25, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Retain]
  • September 13, 2016: [Notice of Letter of Dismissal]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 27, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 20, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 16, 2016: [Summons Reissued]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Summons Issued]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • February 19, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • February 19, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.