U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00078
  • Case Name: D.L. Evans Bank v. Wissel Farms Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 06, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 06, 2016: [Stipulation]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Statement]
  • April 26, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • April 26, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 14, 2016: [Notice of Bankruptcy Filing]
  • April 12, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • April 11, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • April 04, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 01, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 21, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 21, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 18, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 17, 2016: [Sever]
  • March 16, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 15, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • March 15, 2016: [Order]
  • March 15, 2016: [Errata]
  • March 14, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • March 14, 2016: [Errata]
  • March 14, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 14, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 26, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 25, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • February 22, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • February 22, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 22, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.