U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00081
  • Case Name: Garriott et al v. Kootenai Hospital District et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 02, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • February 17, 2017: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 17, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 15, 2017: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • February 14, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order]
  • February 14, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 10, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 18, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 18, 2017: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 17, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 17, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 11, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 05, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 04, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Partial Summary Judgment]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • September 23, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • September 13, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • September 01, 2016: [Partial Summary Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • August 03, 2016: [Stipulation]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 20, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 15, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 11, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2016: [Disclosure Statement]
  • June 16, 2016: [Order]
  • June 16, 2016: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 15, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 15, 2016: [Order]
  • June 15, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • June 15, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • June 13, 2016: [Disclosure Statement]
  • June 07, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • June 06, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 01, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 18, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 06, 2016: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • May 06, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • April 26, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 25, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 25, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 25, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 20, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 19, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
  • April 19, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 23, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • March 22, 2016: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • March 22, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 15, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 14, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 07, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 07, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 04, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 03, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 02, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 02, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • March 01, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 01, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 01, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 01, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order]
  • February 25, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 24, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • February 24, 2016: [Redacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.