U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00082
  • Case Name: Seehawer v. Kehoe et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
  • August 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 20, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 20, 2018: [Reopen Case]
  • August 15, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Order]
  • November 15, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 01, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 01, 2017: [Statement]
  • November 01, 2017: [Release of Bond Obligation]
  • November 01, 2017: [Reopen Case]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Order]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Stipulation]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 15, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • May 04, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • May 04, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 06, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • April 06, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 04, 2017: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Order]
  • March 30, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 30, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 30, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 27, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 01, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 17, 2016: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • November 17, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 17, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • November 16, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 10, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order]
  • November 08, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 19, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • October 19, 2016: [Reconsideration]
July, 2016
  • July 07, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • July 07, 2016: [Transcript]
  • July 01, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • June 29, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 28, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 17, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • June 06, 2016: [Order Staying Case]
  • June 06, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 06, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 06, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 03, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • June 02, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • June 01, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Order]
  • May 31, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 31, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 31, 2016: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • May 25, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 24, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 23, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 23, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order]
  • May 17, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 16, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 10, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 09, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 06, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • April 27, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 19, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 19, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 18, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • April 15, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 15, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 05, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • April 05, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 04, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 24, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • March 23, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 23, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 23, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 23, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 22, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 22, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 08, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 24, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • February 24, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.