U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00083
  • Case Name: Western Watersheds Project et al v. Schneider et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 01, 2021: [Intervene]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [File Excess Pages]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Partial Summary Judgment]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • April 16, 2020: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 16, 2020: [Administrative Record]
  • April 01, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Notice of Substitution]
  • March 30, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 30, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • March 27, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 27, 2020: [Intervene]
  • March 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 26, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 17, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 02, 2020: [Stipulation]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Notice of Substitution]
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Administrative Record]
  • January 03, 2020: [Appeal Transcript]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Transcript Request]
  • December 23, 2019: [Appeal Transcript Request]
  • December 21, 2019: [Transcript Request]
  • December 20, 2019: [Appellants Brief]
  • December 20, 2019: [Appeal Transcript Request]
  • December 19, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 17, 2019: [Supplement]
  • December 17, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 16, 2019: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
  • December 16, 2019: [Supplement]
  • December 16, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 13, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 13, 2019: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Amicus Brief]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 22, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 21, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
  • August 19, 2019: [Supplement]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order]
  • August 16, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 12, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 08, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 05, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 01, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 01, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 27, 2019: [File Excess Pages]
  • June 25, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 24, 2019: [Errata]
  • June 21, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 17, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 14, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • June 14, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 14, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 14, 2019: [File Amicus Brief]
  • June 14, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 14, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • June 11, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 11, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 07, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 31, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 31, 2019: [Sever]
  • May 31, 2019: [Administrative Record]
  • May 31, 2019: [File Excess Pages]
  • May 30, 2019: [Sever]
  • May 28, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 24, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 24, 2019: [Crossclaim]
  • May 23, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 17, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 03, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 02, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 02, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 01, 2019: [Response to Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • April 26, 2019: [Statement]
  • April 25, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 25, 2019: [Intervene]
  • April 25, 2019: [Statement]
  • April 24, 2019: [Intervene]
  • April 22, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 22, 2019: [Declaration]
  • April 19, 2019: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 19, 2019: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 18, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 17, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 17, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 27, 2019: [Supplement]
  • March 06, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order Staying Case]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Status Report]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
  • September 24, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Status Report]
  • May 07, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Status Report]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Status Report]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Status Report]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 11, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 11, 2017: [Status Report]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 13, 2017: [Order Staying Case]
  • July 13, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 12, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
  • July 11, 2017: [Stay]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • June 16, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 16, 2017: [Stipulation]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 23, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 20, 2017: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • March 17, 2017: [Administrative Record]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Sever]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to File Amicus Brief]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Order]
  • January 24, 2017: [Order]
  • January 24, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 24, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 23, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 14, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 13, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2016
  • August 09, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 09, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 08, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 03, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 01, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 01, 2016: [Strike]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 25, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 21, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 21, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 20, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 15, 2016: [File Amicus Brief]
  • July 15, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • July 14, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
  • July 14, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 13, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 12, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • July 08, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 08, 2016: [Withdrawal of a document]
  • July 06, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Intervene]
  • June 30, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 30, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • June 30, 2016: [Sever]
  • June 24, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 15, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 14, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • June 13, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • June 13, 2016: [Intervene]
  • June 10, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 10, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 02, 2016: [Order]
  • June 02, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 27, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • May 26, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 18, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 13, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • May 05, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 04, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 04, 2016: [Intervene]
  • May 03, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 03, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 03, 2016: [Errata]
  • May 03, 2016: [Supplement]
  • May 02, 2016: [Intervene]
  • May 02, 2016: [Response to Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 22, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reassign Case]
  • April 12, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 11, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • April 08, 2016: [Reassign Case]
  • April 07, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 07, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 07, 2016: [Intervene]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 09, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 09, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 04, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Order]
  • February 26, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 25, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • February 25, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.