U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00084
  • Case Name: Villasenor v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [USCA Order]
March, 2017
  • March 13, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 07, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2016
  • October 06, 2016: [Request]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Letter]
August, 2016
  • August 10, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • July 27, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • July 01, 2016: [Request]
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • June 10, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2016
  • May 10, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 11, 2016: [Receipt]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Order]
  • March 29, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 29, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 02, 2016: [Consent Filed]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • February 25, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • February 25, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • February 25, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • February 25, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.