U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00085
  • Case Name: Hogue et al v. White et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • January 19, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Return Mail]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order]
  • November 08, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Return Mail]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Letter]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • February 25, 2016: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • February 25, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 25, 2016: [Complaint]
  • February 25, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • February 25, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.