U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00087
  • Case Name: Omerovic et al v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 20, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 19, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 19, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Withdrawal of a document]
  • July 12, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 09, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • November 28, 2016: [Order]
  • November 28, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 16, 2016: [Stipulation]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • September 12, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order]
  • September 12, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • August 12, 2016: [Compel]
  • August 05, 2016: [ADR Plan]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order]
  • July 13, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • May 05, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 02, 2016: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 24, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • March 23, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 23, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 22, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 01, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • February 29, 2016: [Redacted Document]
  • February 29, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.