U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00089
  • Case Name: Carlson v. Bonner County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 19, 2016: [Order]
  • August 18, 2016: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
June, 2016
  • June 08, 2016: [Order]
  • June 08, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 07, 2016: [Stipulation]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Order]
  • May 20, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 19, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • May 19, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
April, 2016
  • April 08, 2016: [Consent Filed]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 17, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 09, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 03, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • March 02, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order]
  • March 02, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 02, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • March 02, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 01, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.