U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00092
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Boyle
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Abstract Issued]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • July 15, 2016: [Declaration]
  • July 15, 2016: [Default Judgment]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Clerks Entry of Default]
April, 2016
  • April 13, 2016: [Order]
  • April 05, 2016: [Declaration]
  • April 05, 2016: [Entry of Default]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • March 09, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • March 03, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.