U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00489
  • Case Name: Joyner v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Order]
  • March 14, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 14, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 14, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 05, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • March 05, 2018: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 02, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Response to Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 26, 2017: [Reconsideration]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 21, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 21, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 03, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 03, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 01, 2016: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
  • July 01, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • June 30, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 16, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2016
  • April 05, 2016: [Return Mail]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • March 04, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.