U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00093
  • Case Name: Conerly v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 18, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 06, 2016: [Response (generic)]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order]
  • April 22, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • April 22, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 22, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • March 22, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 10, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • March 07, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • March 07, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 07, 2016: [Complaint]
  • March 07, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 07, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.