U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00094
  • Case Name: Hunter v. TMI Group Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order]
  • January 18, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [ADR Plan]
June, 2016
  • June 01, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 24, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • May 23, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 19, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • May 02, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 02, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 20, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • April 12, 2016: [Consent Filed]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 24, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 23, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 23, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 14, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 07, 2016: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.