U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00098
  • Case Name: Allan v. St. Luke's Regional Medical Center, Ltd
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 17, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 12, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Order]
  • June 30, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 21, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • June 21, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 20, 2016: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
  • June 20, 2016: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • June 20, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • June 06, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • May 07, 2016: [Stipulation]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • April 12, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 29, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 14, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 11, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • March 11, 2016: [Order]
  • March 08, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • March 07, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.