U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00095
  • Case Name: Stone v. Nielsen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Corrective Entry]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 27, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 27, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 29, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 19, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 17, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: [Response to Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Reconsideration]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Letter]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2017
  • May 12, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 04, 2017: [Response to Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: [Return Mail]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 22, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • March 06, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Order]
  • September 08, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 08, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2016
  • August 03, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • August 01, 2016: [Response (generic)]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Letter]
  • June 22, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 13, 2016: [Request]
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • May 17, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • May 16, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 03, 2016: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order]
  • May 03, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 03, 2016: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 22, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 22, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • March 22, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • March 22, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • March 08, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • March 08, 2016: [Complaint]
  • March 08, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • March 08, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.