U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00096
  • Case Name: Knight v. State of Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Letter]
September, 2016
  • September 06, 2016: [Receipt]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • August 08, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
May, 2016
  • May 03, 2016: [Order]
  • May 03, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 22, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • March 22, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • March 22, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 08, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • March 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 08, 2016: [Complaint]
  • March 08, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • March 08, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.