U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cv-00024
  • Case Name: DeRock v. Boise City et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [USCA Memorandum]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [USCA Order]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 28, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • September 27, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 26, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • September 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 26, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 25, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 10, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Relief]
  • February 24, 2017: [Response to Motion]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2016
  • October 06, 2016: [ADR Plan]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 01, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • July 01, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
June, 2016
  • June 07, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 13, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • May 03, 2016: [Leave to File Document]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge]
  • March 17, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 08, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • March 08, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.