U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00099
  • Case Name: Pica et al v. Planet Beach Franchising Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 11, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
July, 2016
  • July 11, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 24, 2016: [Response to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Compel]
  • May 13, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 13, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • May 13, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • May 04, 2016: [Consent Filed]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 13, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 11, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
March, 2016
  • March 15, 2016: [Order]
  • March 15, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 09, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • March 09, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • March 08, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 08, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.