U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00100
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Martsch
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 13, 2016: [Judgment - Consent]
  • September 06, 2016: [Stipulation]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2016
  • May 10, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 09, 2016: [Notice of Bankruptcy Filing]
April, 2016
  • April 12, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order]
  • April 04, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
March, 2016
  • March 11, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • March 10, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.