U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00103
  • Case Name: Wilks Funeral Home, LLC v. SimplexGrinnell LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 03, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2016
  • August 05, 2016: [Order]
  • August 05, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
April, 2016
  • April 14, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 22, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 14, 2016: [Supplement]
  • March 14, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 14, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 14, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • March 14, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Notice of Removal]
  • March 11, 2016: [Supplement]
  • March 11, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • March 11, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.