U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00536
  • Case Name: Ireland v. RTR1, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 19, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 19, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 11, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 11, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.