U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cv-00102
  • Case Name: Idaho Rivers United Inc et al v. Probert et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 05, 2018: [USCA Order]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 28, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • September 26, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [USCA Order]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 09, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 19, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • August 19, 2016: [Stay]
  • August 19, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Transcript]
  • July 29, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 20, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • July 11, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 23, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • June 01, 2016: [Transcript Request]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 27, 2016: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 26, 2016: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • May 26, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 25, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 23, 2016: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
  • May 12, 2016: [Order]
  • May 12, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 12, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 12, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 11, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 04, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 26, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 26, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 22, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 22, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 20, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 19, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 19, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • April 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 15, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 14, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 11, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • April 11, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 11, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 11, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 11, 2016: [Approve Consent Judgment]
  • April 11, 2016: [Intervene]
  • April 11, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 08, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 07, 2016: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • April 06, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 06, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 06, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 06, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 25, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 24, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • March 23, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • March 23, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 23, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 23, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • March 23, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 23, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • March 23, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 15, 2016: [Order]
  • March 15, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 14, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • March 11, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.