U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00104
  • Case Name: Supertanks, LLC v. Tuff Tanks, LLP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 18, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 03, 2017: [Status Report]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 11, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 02, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • October 31, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 31, 2016: [Seal]
  • October 26, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 19, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 14, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 12, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 07, 2016: [Response to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 19, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • September 19, 2016: [Seal]
  • September 19, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • September 13, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 12, 2016: [ADR Plan]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • August 25, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 24, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 24, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • July 12, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • July 11, 2016: [Stipulation]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 21, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • June 21, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
  • June 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 07, 2016: [Status Report]
  • June 07, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [ADR Plan]
  • May 10, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 09, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 05, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 05, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 05, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
  • March 16, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • March 14, 2016: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • March 14, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • March 14, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.