U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00108
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Pratt et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Memorandum Decision]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order]
  • June 01, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [USCA Order]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [USCA Order]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Notice of Bankruptcy Filing]
  • February 11, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 23, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Notice of Bankruptcy Filing]
  • December 04, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • December 04, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • December 03, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • December 03, 2019: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • December 02, 2019: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
November, 2019
  • November 29, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 27, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 19, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • November 18, 2019: [Response to Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 30, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 28, 2019: [Recusal]
  • October 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 04, 2019: [Abstract Issued]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order]
  • October 02, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • October 01, 2019: [Alter Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [USCA Memorandum]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [USCA Order]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [USCA Order]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [USCA Order]
November, 2017
  • November 03, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • November 03, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • November 03, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 03, 2017: [Judgment]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 21, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 14, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 09, 2017: [Seal Document]
  • June 09, 2017: [Sealed Document]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 24, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 22, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 19, 2017: [Supplement]
  • May 19, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
  • May 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 05, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 03, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order]
  • April 07, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 04, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2017
  • March 10, 2017: [Order]
  • March 10, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 10, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [Response to Motion]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 18, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 18, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Default Judgment]
  • December 19, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 27, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 14, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 12, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • October 12, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • October 06, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • July 26, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 22, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 24, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 14, 2016: [Service by Publication]
  • June 02, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 02, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Judgment - Default]
  • May 11, 2016: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • May 10, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 09, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • May 06, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • May 03, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • May 03, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
  • May 02, 2016: [Entry of Default]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 21, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • April 20, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 20, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order]
  • April 19, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 19, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 12, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order]
  • April 01, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • March 25, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 25, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 18, 2016: [Summons Reissued]
  • March 17, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • March 16, 2016: [Errata]
  • March 16, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 15, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.