U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00110
  • Case Name: Innes et al v. Gerlits
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 13, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2016
  • October 07, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 05, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 05, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Order]
  • August 26, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 23, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 26, 2016: [Substitute Party]
  • July 26, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order]
  • July 08, 2016: [ADR Plan]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • May 11, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 10, 2016: [Order]
  • May 10, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 04, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Notice of Death]
  • April 04, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 16, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • March 15, 2016: [Supplement]
  • March 15, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.