U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00107
  • Case Name: Access Behavioral Health Services, Inc. v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 13, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Stipulation]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • October 26, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 23, 2017: [Stipulation]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 05, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 01, 2017: [Response to Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2017: [Strike]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Declaration]
  • March 31, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 22, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 08, 2017: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 08, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 08, 2017: [Response to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Order]
  • February 17, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • February 15, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • February 13, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Order]
  • January 03, 2017: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Stipulation]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Order]
  • November 15, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 07, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2016
  • September 01, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 01, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order]
  • July 25, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 25, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • July 25, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • July 19, 2016: [Consent Filed]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 16, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 16, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • March 15, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 15, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • March 15, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 14, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.