U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00106
  • Case Name: Hall et al v. Childers et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 06, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order Staying Case]
August, 2016
  • August 01, 2016: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 26, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • July 26, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • July 11, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 03, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • June 02, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 02, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 31, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 25, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • May 23, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 20, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 17, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 17, 2016: [Declaration]
  • May 17, 2016: [Service]
  • May 02, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [Receipt]
  • March 16, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • March 16, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.