U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00043
  • Case Name: Wall v. United States Department of Agriculture Forest Service Northern Region One et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 12, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 12, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 09, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • September 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 25, 2016: [Supplement]
  • August 04, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 13, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 13, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Supplement]
  • April 19, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
  • April 12, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 05, 2016: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • April 04, 2016: [Response to Motion]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 29, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • March 28, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 15, 2016: [Errata]
  • March 15, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.