U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00290
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Real Property located at 424 East Elgin Street, Caldwell, Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Declaration]
June, 2016
  • June 01, 2016: [Judgment]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 24, 2016: [Order]
  • May 20, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 20, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order]
  • May 16, 2016: [Order]
  • May 09, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • May 09, 2016: [Claim]
April, 2016
  • April 14, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 12, 2016: [Judgment - Default]
  • April 11, 2016: [Default Judgment]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 22, 2016: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.