U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00264
  • Case Name: United States of America v. 12 Calle Pelicano, San Clemente, Orange County, California
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Dismiss]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 28, 2017: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Notice of Letter of Dismissal]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Order]
  • September 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Order]
  • July 20, 2016: [Stipulation]
June, 2016
  • June 10, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 09, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 08, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 25, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order]
  • March 17, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.