U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00113
  • Case Name: Clayton Lilya v. Midland Funding, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 20, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 16, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • June 16, 2016: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • April 22, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • April 22, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 22, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • March 17, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.