U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00115
  • Case Name: Stakey v. Idaho Package Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 18, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 13, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 24, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • August 24, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • June 13, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • June 13, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 13, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 13, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 17, 2017: [Supplement]
  • May 05, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 19, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 18, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2017
  • March 01, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 01, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 01, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • March 01, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 23, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 10, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Discovery]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 25, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 11, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 11, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 04, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 16, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • September 09, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • June 27, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • June 24, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 24, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • March 17, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.